# Maths Trick Chapter 1

Lesson
These lessons are based on Vedic Maths” principles and other maths tricks. These principles are general in nature and can be applied in many ways and very very useful in commercial mathematics. I hope all of you like these lessons and make your calculation faster and save a lot of time in daily calculations and examinations or any entrance test like CAT /IIT /BANK PO /ENGINEERING ENTRANCE TEST/PMT /MCA ENTRANCE TEST/MBA ENTRANCE TEST etc
Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures are the same and the last figures add to1 0. 42 x 48 = Both numbers here start with 4 and the last figures (2 and 8) add up to 10. just multiply 4 by 5 (the next number up) to get 20 for the first part of the answer. And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to get the last part of the answer Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures add up 10 and the last figures are same 44X64 Here first figures are 4 and 6 and there add up 10 and unit figures of both number are same Just multiplying the last figures 4×4=16 Put it at right-hand side Again multiplying the first figures and add common digit(4×6 )+4=24+4=28 put it at left-hand side Now we get required answer2816

Similarly, 36×76, 6X6 =36 right-hand side, (3×7)+6= 21+6=27 left-hand side Required answer is 2736 NOTE If multiplication of last figures is less than 10 add zero before unit digit Ex 81×21, 1×1=01,( 8×2)+1= 16+1=17 Required answer 1701 Method for multiplying numbers where the first number”s add up10 and the second number’s digits are same 46X55 Here the first number adds up is 10 and the second number “s digits are common i. e 5 Just multiplying last figures of both numbers 6×5 =30 put it at right-hand side Again multiplying first figures of both numbers and add common digit of the second number (4×5)+5 =20+5 =25 put it left-hand side
Lesson1 Multiplying numbers just over 100. 108 x 109 = 11772
The answer is in two parts: 117 and 72, 117 is just 108 + 9 (or 109 + 8), and 72 is just 8 x 9. Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342
HOW USEFUL IS THIS CALCULATION!
EXAMPLE 1 Compute the amount and the compound interest on Rs 10000. 00 on 2. years at4%per annum. Now 4×4=16 and 4+4=8 put 10 it becomes Rs 10816. 00 How simple! o calculation no extra time! Practice Test 1 Solve mentally these questions Note down your calculation time by watch (Suggested time 90 seconds) 22 X 28 35 X 35 48 X 42 73 X 33 12 X 92 48 X 28 28 X 22 37 X 88 91 X 66 118 X105 109 X108 112 X106 91 X 99 33 X 37 55X55 Now check your answer with the help of a calculator

## Calculate the price of your order

550 words
We'll send you the first draft for approval by September 11, 2018 at 10:52 AM
Total price:
\$26
The price is based on these factors:
Number of pages
Urgency
Basic features
• Free title page and bibliography
• Unlimited revisions
• Plagiarism-free guarantee
• Money-back guarantee
On-demand options
• Writer’s samples
• Part-by-part delivery
• Overnight delivery
• Copies of used sources
Paper format
• 275 words per page
• 12 pt Arial/Times New Roman
• Double line spacing
• Any citation style (APA, MLA, Chicago/Turabian, Harvard)

# Our guarantees

Delivering a high-quality product at a reasonable price is not enough anymore.
That’s why we have developed 5 beneficial guarantees that will make your experience with our service enjoyable, easy, and safe.

### Money-back guarantee

You have to be 100% sure of the quality of your product to give a money-back guarantee. This describes us perfectly. Make sure that this guarantee is totally transparent.

### Zero-plagiarism guarantee

Each paper is composed from scratch, according to your instructions. It is then checked by our plagiarism-detection software. There is no gap where plagiarism could squeeze in.

### Free-revision policy

Thanks to our free revisions, there is no way for you to be unsatisfied. We will work on your paper until you are completely happy with the result.